Financial history THE WIRE GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity number: 1148992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £231.24k £219.74k £220.60k £360.57k £485.87k
Total expenditure £239.02k £189.39k £257.55k £316.66k £437.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A