Trustees THE WIRE GYMNASTICS CLUB
Charity number: 1148992

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMA ALICE DOHERTY | Chair | 19 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Gaby Hannibal | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christina Greeg | Trustee | 18 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Holly Doherty | Trustee | 05 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Appleton | Trustee | 05 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Wernham | Trustee | 05 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Forrester | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Leather | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carla Barrick | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
CLARE MARIE BARRICK | Trustee | 18 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN DOHERTY | Trustee | 19 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Allen | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.