FAMILY ADVOCACY PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support parents and carers whose children are subject to child protection issues in the London Borough of Newham. Promoting self-advocacy and providing advocacy services, advice, and information to above client group. Advance the education of families by providing education in parenting skills. Facilitating effective communication between families, social services and other agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 August 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newham
Governance
- 20 December 2012: Standard registration
- 21 March 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 March 2022: Funds transferred to 1048366 STRATFORD ADVICE ARCADE
- FAP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/08/2016 | 01/08/2017 | 01/08/2018 | 01/08/2019 | 01/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.40k | £8.99k | £9.26k | £9.26k | £9.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.91k | £8.28k | £8.73k | £8.73k | £8.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2020 | 02 June 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2019 | 02 June 2021 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2018 | 30 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/08/2011 AS AMENDED ON 05/12/2012
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF VULNERABLE CHILDREN WHO ARE RECEIVING SOCIAL CARE SUPPORT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM BY: I) PROMOTING SELF-ADVOCACY AND PROVIDING ADVOCACY SERVICES, ADVICE, COUNSELLING, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT TO THE PARENTS AND CARERS OF THESE CHILDREN; II) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF FAMILIES IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING EDUCATION IN PARENTING SKILLS; III) FACILITATING EFFECTIVE COMMUNICATION BETWEEN FAMILIES, SOCIAL SERVICES AND OTHER AGENCIES; IV) PROVIDING A FORUM FOR INFLUENCING AGENCY POLICY, PROCEDURE AND PRACTICE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window