THE CHRISTIAN HERITAGE CENTRE AT STONYHURST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Over the last four centuries Stonyhurst College and the Jesuit Order have been entrusted with an astonishing variety of rare and beautiful objects. The Christian Heritage Centre project is to offer education and spiritual formation inspired by the witness these objects bear to the faith story of Catholics in Britain.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 September 2012: Standard registration
- STONYHURST CHRISTIAN HERITAGE CENTRE (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Toby Lees | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Michael Laking | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Matthew Riley | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Rebekah Lamb | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
ANTON DE PIRO D'AMICO INGUANEZ | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Michael Dominic Hurley | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Ryan Christopher | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Franz Forrester | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £264.67k | £264.08k | £99.38k | £174.87k | £104.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £326.72k | £329.77k | £345.42k | £213.60k | £240.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 July 2023 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 03 July 2023 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 October 2022 | 164 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 October 2022 | 164 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/06/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO: 1 ADVANCE EDUCATION INCLUDING THE PROMOTION OF THE UNDERSTANDING OF RELIGION, RELIGIOUS DIVERSITY AND THE SACRED AND SPIRITUAL; AND 2 ADVANCE AND PRESERVE CULTURE AND HERITAGE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, INCLUDING BY (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF A CHRISTIAN HERITAGE CENTRE IN OR AROUND STONYHURST IN LANCASHIRE.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
THEODORE HOUSE
Stonyhurst College
Stonyhurst
CLITHEROE
BB7 9PZ
- Phone:
- 01254827329
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window