ROSEBERY COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To actively promote and provide greater opportunities for the interactive social, recreational and educational life of the community without distinction.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £60,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 18 October 2012: Standard registration
- 27 October 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ROSEBERY ST. PETER'S COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.67k | £60.71k | £75.86k | £81.06k | £731.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.41k | £78.26k | £91.95k | £87.51k | £784.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.87k | £5.12k | £9.45k | £4.34k | £60.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £284.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £250.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £250.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 February 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 31 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 JUL 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 AUG 2018
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF STORER WARD OF LOUGHBOROUGH AND ITS SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE,RACE, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. 2.TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY)IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.THE COMPANY SHALL BE NON PARTY POLITICAL AND THEREFORE THE COMPANY WILL NOT ALLOW ITS PREMISES TO BE USED BY POLITICAL PARTIES TO ADVANCE THEIR CAUSE.
Area of benefit
STORER WARD OF LOUGHBOROUGH AND ITS SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window