LOVE OF GOD MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holds weekly Christian meetings, promote Christian values, Organise conferences of Christian life in the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
Governance
- 18 February 2013: Standard registration
- LOVE OF GOD MINISTRY 2 (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BOSE ADELEYE IBRAHEEM | Chair | 15 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
OBASANJO AKINLABI ABOABA | Trustee | 12 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
OLAWALE CHRISTOPHER OTUSILE | Trustee | 12 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
GIDEON SUNDAY ADEWALE | Trustee | 15 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
OLATUNJI FOLASAYO IBIRONKE | Trustee | 15 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.70k | £39.94k | £30.97k | £35.52k | £42.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.23k | £30.82k | £35.34k | £37.91k | £73.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/06/2012 AS AMENDED ON 30/01/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, HELPING PEOPLE IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED. 2) THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY BY ESTABLISHING A BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AMONGST BOTH CHRISTIANS AND OTHER RELIGIOUS GROUPS THUS REDUCING RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS TENSION IN THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Francis Street
Stratford
London
E15 1JG
- Phone:
- 07985129980
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window