Financial history ASPIRE@SOUTHFIELDS

Charity number: 1149367
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £557.69k £241.11k £506.21k £525.66k £432.24k
Total expenditure £443.62k £351.37k £476.31k £486.89k £452.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £138.55k £6.89k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £506.21k £525.66k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £557.69k N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £443.62k N/A £476.31k £486.89k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A