THE MEGAN'S CHALLENGE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have organised two fundraising events in the fourth year of Megan's Challenge. In May we held our first 10K Fun Run/Walk which took place round the village of Gayton, Norfolk. Following track and road. Our chosen charity for this event was The Norfolk Hospice - Tapping House. In September we held our second Butterfly Ball to raise money for Megan's Challenge
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Cambridgeshire
- Lincolnshire
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 06 August 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN MARK THROWER | Chair | 08 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN HOWARD | Trustee | 08 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE JO-ANN EGGLETON | Trustee | 08 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEBRA JANE LOUISE THROWER | Trustee | 08 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.78k | £135 | £0 | £2.10k | £4.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.92k | £6.98k | £60 | £602 | £3.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 02 April 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 05 April 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 09 April 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 02/08/2012
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME,AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL,AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO,OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF,SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MORGAN TRUSTS & TAX PLANNING
HANSEATIC HOUSE
7A KING STREET
7a King Street
KING'S LYNN
PE30 1ET
- Phone:
- 01553604200
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window