CAMBRIDGE HARMONY CHORUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cambridge Harmony Chorus is a group of women which sings a cappella in the barbershop style. It is a member of LABBS and aims to advance, improve and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of barbershop singing in all its aspects through the performance of barbershop singing and the provision of educational workshops for members of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 21 November 2013: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Peirce | Chair | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Geddes | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE ELIZABETH MANSER | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Whykes M Director | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynette Gilbert | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Shanahan | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANET SULMAN | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Woolhouse | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL RADFORD Vice Chair | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.53k | £3.96k | £3.00k | £2.88k | £13.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.08k | £3.11k | £1.96k | £5.02k | £10.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/05/2012 AS AMENDED ON 12/08/2013 as amended on 17 May 2018 as amended on 01 Jun 2018 as amended on 01 Jun 2018 as amended on 12 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
To advance, improve and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of barbershop and 4 part close harmony singing in all its aspects particularly but not exclusively through: • the performance and presentation of singing; and • the provision of educational workshops for members of the public.
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 CHESTERFIELD ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 1LN
- Phone:
- 01223721650
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window