SHADE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SHADE IS A COMMUNITY ORGANISATION OPERATING IN THE EAST OF LONDON. IT OFFERS A RANGE OF PROJECTS AND SERVICES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE. THESE PROJECTS CAN BE GROUPED INTO THE FOLLOWING THEMES: HEALTH AND SPORTS, SOCIAL CARE AND SUPPORT, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT, HUMANITARIAN AID AND RELIEF, SPIRITUAL AND RELIGIOUS DEVELOPMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 November 2012: Standard registration
- STRIVING TO HELP ADVANCE DEVELOPMENT & EDUCATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Sayeedur Rahman | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Abdul Gofar Khan | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Koyson Khan | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Gaffar | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £434.03k | £449.54k | £364.46k | £478.59k | £456.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £431.47k | £419.39k | £382.24k | £502.12k | £492.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 July 2022 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 July 2022 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 July 2022 | 419 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 24 July 2022 | 419 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 24 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 24 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/11/2011 AS AMENDED ON 05/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 14/04/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO: 1. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN LONDON AND NEIGHBOURING REGIONS BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: A. ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B. ADVANCING EDUCATION; C. PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. 2. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE INHABITANTS OF LONDON AND THE NEIGHBOURING AREAS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. 3. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID.
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 CHURCH ROAD
LONDON
E12 6AF
- Phone:
- 02079987768
- Email:
- info@theShade.org
- Website:
-
theShade.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window