SKI 2 FREEDOM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise awareness of empowering health benefits of snow-sports & winter mountain experiences, enhancing the life of anyone whose day-to-day life is challenged by a life-changing or life-limiting illness, disease or disability. We help make dreams come true & offer the opportunity to overcome adversity, find resilience, all for the benefit of family and social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Austria
- France
- Italy
- Switzerland
Governance
- 20 March 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Charles Hugh Phillips | Chair | 14 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Neill | Trustee | 07 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE COSBY | Trustee | 21 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MAX COSBY BA | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.29k | £30.00k | £12.86k | £5.41k | £1.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.31k | £27.00k | £12.15k | £4.88k | £2.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 316 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 316 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 September 2022 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 September 2022 | 457 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 August 2020 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 August 2020 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/05/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 03/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, SPECIAL NEEDS AND LIFE CHALLENGING CONDITIONS, AND THEIR FAMILIES THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND INFORMATION FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SNOW-SPORT ACTIVITIES, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
106 Cambridge Street
London
SW1V 4QG
- Phone:
- 01747829627
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window