Financial history BODHI TREE BRIGHTON

Charity number: 1149694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £5.24k £2.81k £1.85k £1.18k £4.68k
Total expenditure £6.81k £1.06k £1.52k £896 £3.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A