Financial history MANGO TREE GOA

Charity number: 1148049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £100.09k £152.48k £90.32k £84.26k £89.99k
Total expenditure £155.70k £177.87k £86.15k £81.27k £85.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A