Financial history BRAMFORD OPEN SPACES LTD

Charity number: 1149928
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.51k £19.03k £8.47k £8.38k £13.60k
Total expenditure £8.14k £19.56k £7.79k £6.94k £14.20k
Income from government contracts N/A £8.22k N/A N/A £8.22k
Income from government grants N/A £4.15k N/A N/A N/A