Accounts and annual returns CARMEL VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 502926
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 25 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 06 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 October 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2016 23 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required