HEATON HAWKS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Junior Football Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
68 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 27 November 2012: Standard registration
- HEATON HAWKS AMATEUR FOOTBALL CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Alexander McGuckin | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Wright | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Richard Martin | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.88k | £41.59k | £87.26k | £85.78k | £92.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.72k | £36.82k | £83.00k | £73.45k | £78.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 194 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 194 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 March 2023 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 March 2023 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JUL 2011 AS AMENDED ON 31/07/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Eaglescliffe Drive
Cochrane Park
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE7 7RT
- Phone:
- 07969393625
- Email:
- pwright68@virginmedia.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window