COMMUNITY LIBRARY IN PAINSWICK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
running a community library in the village of Painswick.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £12,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 30 August 2012: Standard registration
- PAINSWICK COMMUNITY LIBRARY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Hopkins | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Buckland-Smith | Trustee | 30 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Amy Cumming | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Henry Kenchington | Trustee | 08 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mona Liza Jennifer Polo | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Charles Collins | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Agnes Parker | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ian Michael Cridland | Trustee | 14 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.00k | £10.04k | £10.31k | £11.50k | £12.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.47k | £9.49k | £8.14k | £10.94k | £12.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.50k | £10.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | £12.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 JUN 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/08/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE MAINTENANCE AND OPERATION OF A LIBRARY IN THE VILLAGE OF PAINSWICK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PAINSWICK COMMUNITY LIBRARY
TOWN HALL
VICTORIA STREET
PAINSWICK
STROUD
GL6 6QA
- Phone:
- 01452814744
- Website:
-
painswickcommunitylibrary.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window