WAVENEY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE & ABUSE FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Domestic Violence & Abuse awareness raising & training for individuals & organisations. Advice, guidance & support for victims & their families. Support & training for Freedom Programme. We run a 1 to 1 Trauma Therapy service We produce & distribute leaflets & poster campaigns. Our website has information on programmes & services available in Waveney www.waveneydvforum.org.uk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £35,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 11 October 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christina Batters | Chair | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Carr | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Johnson | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tamara Allen | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Michelle Calver | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Jones | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Tripp | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.71k | £77.39k | £62.28k | £67.70k | £93.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.20k | £72.99k | £70.93k | £60.66k | £99.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k | £29.76k | £30.10k | N/A | £35.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 FEB 2012 AS AMENDED ON 27/09/2012 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/2015 as amended on 18 Mar 2021 as amended on 20 May 2021
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF THOSE WHO ARE, OR WHO HAVE BEEN EXPOSED TO DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND ABUSE, BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVICE AND TRAINING. DOMESTIC ABUSE CAN INCLUDE ANY INCIDENT OR PATTERN OF INCIDENTS OF VIOLENCE AND ABUSE, THAT OCCUR BY WAY OF COERCIVE CONTROL, CONTROLLING OR THREATENING BEHAVIOUR BETWEEN INTIMATE PARTNERS OR FAMILY MEMBERS, REGARDLESS OF GENDER, SEXUALITY, ETHNICITY OR RELIGIOUS BELIEF. 2.TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, ORGANISATIONS, AND AGENCIES IN ALL ASPECTS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE, INCLUDING ITS IMPACT ON INDIVIDUALS AND A WIDER SOCIETY, AND MEET WITH OTHER AGENCIES ON A REGULAR BASIS TO DISCUSS THE BEST WAYS TO ACHIEVE THE AIMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Kirkley Centre
154 London Road South
South Lowestoft
LOWESTOFT
NR33 0AZ
- Phone:
- 01502572143
- Email:
- info@waveneydvforum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window