Financial history LEICESTER CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 502932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.01k £108 £4.83k £4.16k £8.15k
Total expenditure £17.01k £2.80k £4.46k £5.96k £5.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A