Financial history ALLIED SERVICES TRUST

Charity Number: 1148194
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £74.37k £102.26k £134.83k £223.96k £162.02k
Total expenditure £87.86k £100.82k £124.62k £139.14k £172.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £9.50k N/A N/A N/A