ALLIED SERVICES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AST offers professional services to empower people to prepare for lack of capacity and assisting them at times of vulnerability, we provide: Education: We raise awareness, demonstrating unbiased options available to prepare for lack of capacity. Assistance: We support individuals in the creation of documents. Administration: We will act for those who have no lay attorney or deputy to appoint.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Martin John Broad | Chair | 29 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew Batey | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER BURRELL | Trustee | 29 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.37k | £102.26k | £134.83k | £223.96k | £162.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.86k | £100.82k | £124.62k | £139.14k | £172.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
4.1 TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN AND MEMBERS OF THE UNIFORMED PUBLIC EMERGENCY SERVICES IN RELATION TO PERSONAL FINANCIAL AND WELFARE MATTERS. 4.2 TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC, MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN AND MEMBERS OF THE UNIFORMED PUBLIC EMERGENCY SERVICES BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES IN RELATION TO PERSONAL FINANCIAL AND WELFARE MATTERS. 4.3 SUCH OTHER PURPOSES THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. IN THESE OBJECTS, "PERSONAL FINANCIAL AND WELFARE MATTERS" MEANS POWERS OF ATTORNEY, ADMINISTRATION OF POWERS OF ATTORNEY, ADVANCE DECISIONS, DEPUTYSHIP APPLICATIONS, DEPUTYSHIP ADMINISTRATIONS AND ALL COURT OF PROTECTION RELATED MATTERS AND ANY OTHER RELATED NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Granary
Newlands Manor Farm
Everton
LYMINGTON
Hampshire
SO41 0BG
- Phone:
- 01590644073
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window