SUNFLOWERS AT GRAFTON

Charity Number: 1147882
Charity reporting is up to date (95 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of great childcare on a not for profit basis, which utilises the beautiful natural surroundings at Sunflowers at Grafton. This includes nursery care for babies and children to 5 years, from 8am to 6pm for 51 weeks; out of school care for primary school children, specifically breakfast, after school and holiday clubs; and daily school transport to one of our local primary schools.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £456,787
Total expenditure: £460,092

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 June 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Clarabut Ratnage Chair 18 May 2020
None on record
Gabriel Edward Winn Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Claire Marie Tarbox Trustee 18 January 2021
None on record
Sarah Elizabeth Wallbank Burkert Trustee 06 July 2020
None on record
Nick Airey Trustee 19 June 2017
None on record
Sue Mccalla Trustee 12 December 2016
None on record
TAMARA REAY Trustee 27 June 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £370.72k £348.83k £424.31k £432.44k £456.79k
Total expenditure £363.11k £354.29k £409.65k £430.61k £460.09k
Income from government contracts £15.18k £15.26k £15.34k £15.75k £16.61k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 03 October 2024 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 03 October 2024 95 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 27 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Sunflowers at Grafton
East Grafton
Marlborough
SN8 3DB
Phone:
01672810478