Financial history OPERATION FLORIAN LIMITED

Charity number: 1149445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £23.81k £152.35k £40.47k £117.33k £117.72k
Total expenditure £31.14k £23.95k £102.29k £118.95k £66.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A