BRITISH HAJJ DELEGATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of free medical services to British and other pilgrims during the annual Hajj pilgrimage to Saudi Arabia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Saudi Arabia
Governance
- 11 April 2013: Standard registration
- BHD (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Noreen Khan | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr MOHAMMED JIVA MBE | Trustee | 13 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
DR SYED MOHIUD-DIN MBE | Trustee | 13 July 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.59k | £0 | £220 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 September 2024 | 243 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 JUN 2012 AS AMENDED ON 22/01/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF ISLAM AND THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: • EDUCATING POTENTIAL PILGRIMS ON MATTERS RELATING TO GOOD HEALTH AND PREPARATION PRIOR TO HAJJ • EDUCATING ON DIET AND EXERCISE PRE-HAJJ TO ENSURE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL PREPARATION • SUPPORTING UK PILGRIMS IN OBTAINING THE NECESSARY PRE-HAJJ VACCINATIONS • WORKING WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS BOTH POLITICAL AND NON-POLITICAL TO ENSURE THAT SERVICES FOR PILGRIMS ARE CO-ORDINATED AND EFFICIENT • PROVIDING 'ON THE GROUND MEDICAL ADVICE, SUPPORT AND BASIC MEDICAL TREATMENT TO BRITISH HAJJIS (PILGRIMS) ATTENDING THE ANNUAL HAJJ PILGRIMAGE IN THE KINGDOM OF SAUDI ARABIA PRIOR TO, DURING AND AFTER THE HAJJ PERIOD AND GUIDANCE ON ACCESSING THE NHS ON RETURNING TO THE UK • CAMPAIGNING FOR IMPROVEMENTS TO THE HAJJ ARRANGEMENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF BRITISH HAJJIS - (PILGRIMS) • WORKING TOWARDS THE GENERAL WELFARE OF MUSLIMS AROUND THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
SNODWORTH HALL
SNODWORTH ROAD
LANGHO
BLACKBURN
BB6 8DS
- Phone:
- 0000 0000 00
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window