SKATEISTAN UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Skateistan is an award-winning international non-profit organization empowering children through skateboarding and education in Afghanistan, Cambodia and South Africa. Through their innovative programs, Outreach, Skate and Create, Back-to-School and Youth Leadership, Skateistan aims to give youth the opportunity to become leaders for a better world
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 July 2012: Standard registration
- 09 August 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 December 2017: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Staines | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Butler | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Callan | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ben Gregor | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julia Markwell | Trustee | 27 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.91k | £10.95k | £6.44k | £675 | £447 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £108 | £443 | £486 | £497 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 FEB 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 1.TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR SKATEBOARDING AND OTHER SUCH SIMILAR ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE; 2.TO ADVANCE EDUCATION; 3.TO PROMOTE EQUALITY BETWEEN WOMEN AND MEN, AND BETWEEN GIRLS AND BOYS, AND TO ELIMINATE GENDER DISCRIMINATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC;AND 4.THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY PARTICULARLY (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) THE PROMOTION OF HARMONY BETWEEN ETHNIC GROUPS; IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN AFGHANISTAN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 1
11 BEULAH ROAD
LONDON
E17 9LG
- Phone:
- 0049 30 91492101
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window