Financial history ZAKAT FOUNDATION OF INDIA (INTERNATIONAL)

Charity number: 1149542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £17.27k £4.04k £17.13k £21.87k £25.78k
Total expenditure £2.15k £25.60k £26.03k £13.59k £10.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A