Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF VALLEY END COE INFANT SCHOOL

Charity number: 1148473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 03 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 August 2024 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required