MINERVA ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Minerva Arts is an arts education organisation working in the Chester and Cheshire area. The core of our work is a Youth Theatre that offers opportunities for young people between 11 and 18 to participate in drama and arts activities. This year we have also been responsible for two funded projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
Total income includes £13,908 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 October 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Robbins | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Euston | Trustee | 02 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mike Brocken | Trustee | 26 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
GLEN MESKELL | Trustee | 23 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
James Merron | Trustee | 19 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
LUCY PARRY | Trustee | 25 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.09k | £26.72k | £61.06k | £34.93k | £16.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.84k | £25.64k | £50.87k | £47.97k | £29.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £2.00k | £7.59k | N/A | £13.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 04 March 2025 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 JUN 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/10/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF, AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE PERFORMING ART IN NORTH WEST ENGLAND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT,INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A YOUTH THEATRE, THE STAGING OF PERFORMING ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC AND OUTREACH WORKSHOPS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Beaconsfield Street
CHESTER
CH3 5AY
- Phone:
- 07894858934
- Email:
- steph@minervaarts.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window