LIVING WORD MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND FURTHER THE GOSPEL OF GOD AND HIS SON THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND TO PREACH AND TEACH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. TO RELIEVE POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ghana
- India
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Philippines
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 18 December 2012: Standard registration
- LWM (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND MARK LENSON WEEDEN | Chair | 24 August 2012 |
|
|||||
JOHN HENRY RAY | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Riley | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jean Pamela Wareham | Trustee | 30 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Val Hunter | Trustee | 14 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.96k | £48.14k | £57.99k | £44.60k | £35.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.23k | £30.23k | £27.49k | £40.42k | £40.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26/10/2012
Charitable objects
3(1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND FURTHER THE GOSPEL OF GOD AND HIS SON THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND TO PREACH AND TEACH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. 3(2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Alison Road
CHURCH STRETTON
SY6 7AT
- Phone:
- 07455917082
- Email:
- livingwordmlw@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window