BISHOP'S CASTLE TOWN HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of the public, the preservation, restoration, maintenance, repair and improvement of Bishop's Castle Town Hall, being a grade II* Listed building, situated in Bishop's Castle, Shropshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
Governance
- 10 October 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Fowke | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Rimmer | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grant Perry | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR WEIR CHALKLEY | Trustee | 12 January 2015 |
|
|||||
Jane Carroll | Trustee | 08 May 2014 |
|
|||||
Helen Patricia Vaughan | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANN THEOBALD | Trustee | 17 July 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.92k | £14.97k | £43.95k | £44.80k | £50.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.27k | £10.82k | £39.03k | £51.82k | £61.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 JUN 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/09/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS) ARE: (1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, MAINTENANCE, REPAIR AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE BISHOP'S CASTLE TOWN HALL, BEING A GRADE II* LISTED BUILDING, SITUATED IN BISHOP'S CASTLE, SHROPSHIRE. (2) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE WITHIN BISHOP'S CASTLE, SHROPSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Time
29 High Street
BISHOPS CASTLE
SY9 5BE
- Phone:
- 01588638467
- Email:
- jane.carrol@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window