MJL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our projects reflect issues that Michael cared deeply about: the welfare of children and animals, the protection of the environment and the elimination of needless suffering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
- Haiti
- Liberia
- Malawi
- Romania
Governance
- 25 September 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dee Pfeiffer | Chair | 21 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Lee Sibson | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Frame | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Wallden | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/08/2020 | 07/08/2021 | 07/08/2022 | 07/08/2023 | 07/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.43k | £13.11k | £12.36k | £13.84k | £13.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.75k | £20.47k | £11.76k | £12.87k | £14.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 August 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 August 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 August 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 August 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 August 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 04/09/2012
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF PEOPLE IN NEED THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST CHILDREN BY BUILDING CHILDREN'S HOMES, CLINICS, SCHOOLS AND FAMILY SHELTERS; 2. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; 3. TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 GREAT ARLER ROAD
LEICESTER
LE2 6FG
- Phone:
- 0116-210-8225
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window