HYWEL DDA HEALTH CHARITIES

Charity Number: 1147863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is a grant making charity, the purpose of which is the relief of those who are ill or disabled and the advancement of education through training.The majority of grant payments are made as contributions to the NHS. Other grant payments are made for patient and staff welfare and amenities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 September 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • HYWEL DDA GENERAL FUND CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HYWEL DDA UNIVERSITY LOCAL HEALTH BOARD Trustee 29 January 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.14m £2.51m £1.18m £3.98m £2.68m
Total expenditure £2.83m £1.30m £2.05m £1.25m £3.45m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.80m £1.67m £832.00k £3.57m £2.22m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £4.00k £12.99k £14.96k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £331.00k £327.00k £315.00k £405.38k £451.15k
Income - Other £13.00k £511.00k £24.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £942.00k £841.00k £281.00k £1.92m £1.42m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.59m £1.04m £1.66m £799.73k £3.15m
Expenditure - Raising funds £240.00k £267.00k £388.00k £451.52k £296.00k
Expenditure - Governance £47.00k £100.00k £106.00k £47.87k £77.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £688.09k £2.90m
Expenditure - Investment management £44.00k £45.00k £50.00k £44.66k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments £7.16m £8.65m £8.85m £8.31m £9.12m
Other assets £1.74m £2.98m £3.21m £5.58m £6.30m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.12m £1.16m £2.28m £1.94m £3.43m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL DATED 4 DECEMBER 1996 AS AFFECTED AS A RESOLUTION MADE UNDER SECTION 91 OF THE NHS ACT 1977
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURCHASE OF EQUIPMENT FOR CARDIOLOGY SERVICES PROVIDED BY THE ACUTE AND COMMUNITY DIVISIONS OF PEMBROKESHIRE & DERWEN NHS TRUST, OR ANY SUCCESSOR BODY
Area of benefit
PEMBROKESHIRE
Registration history
  • 10 September 2003 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
CORPORATE OFFICES
YSTWYTH BUILDING
HAFEN DERWEN
ST DAVID'S PARK
JOBSWELL ROAD
CARMARTH
Phone:
01267248606