LEO (DERBYSHIRE AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Local Enterprise Growth support in the areas of Derbyshire and Nottinghamshire. This includes the provision of free support, advice and coaching to those looking to start new businesses, especially those living in areas of high deprivation. We work with young people equipping them with enterprise skills and capabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 06 March 2013: Standard registration
- 04 May 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.40k | £3.98k | £20 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.28k | £294 | £5.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 27 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 09 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 29 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 DEC 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/05/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/06/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO ANY PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE WITHIN THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO: 4.1 THE PROMOTION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 4.1.1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; 4.1.2 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; 4.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 4.1.4 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (A) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS; OR (B) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; 4.1.5 THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; AND 4.1.6 SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE COMMISSION. 4.2 THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CAPACTIY AND SKILLS FO THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS, THE CHARITY SHALL AT ALL TIMES ACTIVELY PROMOTE AND TAKE INTO CONSIDERATION THE PRINCIPLES OF EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window