Trustees STOKE ON TRENT SOUTH U3A
Charity Number: 1148741

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew John Devin | Chair | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Williams | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Rowley | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Ellis | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Neilson | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Maher | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE FRANCES STEVENSON | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALAN STEVENSON | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEITH WARD | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN GRENVILLE FORD | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.