CG Community Council


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has opened an inquiry Open in new window into the charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Community Council provides support and social activities for older people and in Moss Way Hall, Mossway,Family Centre Croxteth. We also provide activities for Children in Mossway Hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 03 May 1974: Standard registration
- THE CROXTETH AND GILLMOSS COMMUNITY COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER ALLAN SEALEY | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STEPHEN HORNSBY | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.28k | £18.39k | £21.43k | £19.15k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.41k | £18.30k | £20.30k | £19.05k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £12.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £4.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 March 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED NOVEMBER 1968 as amended on 19 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CROXTETH AND GILLMOSS AND ITS IMMEDIATE ENVIRONS WITHOUTH DISTINCTION OF AGE, SEX, RACE, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, INSTITUTIONS, BUSINESSES AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR HEALTH, RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS; AND TO PROMOTE ALL OR ANY OBJECTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
CROXTETH AND GILLMOSS AND ITS IMMEDIATE ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit E29
110 Butterfield Innovation Centre
Great Marlings, Luton
LU2 8DL
- Phone:
- 01515463974
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window