MERE BROW AND DISTRICT INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FULLY EXPLAINED IN THE AREA OF OPERATION ENTRY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 05 February 1974: Standard registration
- MERE BROW VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Howard | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Caunce | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Will Hunter | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Aidrian Pendleton | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BRYAN | Trustee | 27 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CAUNCE | Trustee | 01 March 1972 |
|
|
||||
WARREN HUNTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.30k | £22.42k | £65.43k | £47.52k | £62.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.32k | £31.04k | £50.75k | £68.87k | £77.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21/12/1973 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01/07/1975 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15/05/2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MERE BROW WARD OF THE PARISH OF TARLETON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
MERE BROW WARD OF THE PARISH OF TARLETON
Contact information
- Address:
-
65 The Gravel
Mere Brow
PRESTON
PR4 6JX
- Phone:
- 01772813516
- Email:
- mbvh@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
merebrowvillagehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window