Financial history BE STRONG PROJECT

Charity number: 1148401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £211.32k £218.00k £141.00k £151.00k £179.00k
Total expenditure £175.98k £159.00k £141.00k £153.00k £140.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k N/A N/A N/A