BATH BRIDGE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organised bridge including programmed sessions for social, competition and teaching during the week at Oldfield Old Boys Rugby Club, Shaft Road, Bath BA2 7HP. We also run online events and eduction for our members. See website bathbridgeclub.org
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 11 December 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marion Elizabeth Loudoun | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Laurence Cooper | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.00k | £15.10k | £35.06k | £49.14k | £55.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.51k | £15.12k | £28.68k | £43.06k | £49.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/03/2012 AS AMENDED ON 31/10/2012
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT BY PROMOTING THE GAME OF BRIDGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF BATH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA; AND 2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE LEARNING, TEACHING AND PLAYING OF CONTRACT BRIDGE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE RULES OF THE ENGLISH BRIDGE UNION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF BATH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 CHRISTCHURCH ROAD
BRADFORD-ON-AVON
BA15 1TB
- Phone:
- 01225866591
- Email:
- BATHBRIDGECLUB@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window