ISHA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Isha Foundation, founded by Sadhguru, is a non-religious, non-profit, public service organization, dedicated to raising human consciousness
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income:
£6,402,612
Donations and legacies | £1.10m | |
Charitable activities | £5.26m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £43.34k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,919,131
Raising funds | £40.54k | |
Charitable activities | £3.88m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £40.54k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.88m | |
Retained for future use | £2.48m |
People

9 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Abu Dhabi
- Albania
- Andorra
- Austria
- Bahrain
- Belgium
- Bulgaria
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dubai
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Georgia
- Germany
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Guernsey
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Italy
- Kazakhstan
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Netherlands
- Norway
- Poland
- Romania
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Turkey
- Uganda
- United Arab Emirates
- Uzbekistan
Governance
- 13 June 2013: Standard registration
- 17 December 2024: Funds received from 1116816 ISHA INSTITUTE OF INNER SCIENCES
- ISHA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vinod Rao | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rahul Prakash | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
MOUMITA SEN SARMA | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
NATHALIE THOME | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELIE ZABBAL | Trustee | 26 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.31m | £3.50m | £3.42m | £3.50m | £6.40m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.81m | £1.83m | £2.95m | £2.18m | £3.92m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £171.58k | £5.13k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £27.00k | £178.32k | £855.09k | £278.88k | £1.10m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £504.45k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.28m | £2.82m | £2.56m | £3.22m | £5.26m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.93k | £2.17k | £165 | £996 | £43.34k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.81m | £1.83m | £2.95m | £2.13m | £3.88m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £47.68k | £40.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £27.60k | £37.44k | £52.61k | £48.18k | £80.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £500.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £38.15k | £28.51k | £22.81k | £18.25k | £13.39k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.03m | £3.55m | £4.10m | £7.69m | £9.17m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £283.02k | £142.27k | £224.37k | £1.19m | £183.57k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 MAY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 MAY 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 MAY 2014 as amended on 15 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity are: To advance the education of the public in the art and practice of yoga and meditation, in particular but not exclusively in Kriya Yoga, Pranyama and Hatha Yoga; and To advance any purpose that is charitable under the laws of England and Wales.
Contact information
- Address:
-
149-153 Farnham Road
Big Yellow Self Storage Co. Ltd
Slough
Berkshire
SL1 4XP
- Phone:
- 07720318350
- Email:
- uk@ishafoundation.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window