Financial history FREEZONE RETREAT

Charity number: 1151125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.70k £2.58k £37.15k £38.62k £28.28k
Total expenditure £1.68k £1.89k £26.94k £35.01k £26.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A