SOUTH MANSFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide facilities for local community groups to meet and engage in their particular activity. Occasionally organise events for the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 22 August 2012: Standard registration
- SMCA (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Seymour | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|||||||
Richard Tempest-Mitchell | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|||||||
Charlotte Inkle | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
David Butlin | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
KATHRYN JANE CARLYLE-BUTLIN | Trustee | 19 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.96k | £5.25k | £10.59k | £13.33k | £13.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.49k | £7.27k | £7.66k | £13.18k | £13.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 March 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 20 March 2021 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 AUG 1997
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO: (A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTH MANSFIELD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY THE AREA ENCLOSED BY OLD NEWARK ROAD, SOUTHWELL ROAD, BERRY HILL LANE, AND NOTTINGHAM ROAD, MANSFIELD, (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Peters C Of E Primary Academy
Bellamy Road
MANSFIELD
Nottinghamshire
NG18 4LN
- Phone:
- 01623658663
- Email:
- kj.carlyle@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window