FINISH WELL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide assistance in the provision of facilities in the interest of social welfare, recreation, leisure and time occupation of individuals who are imprisoned, or released from imprisonment, and are suffering from financial hardship or difficult circumstances. Advocating spiritual formation, mental health rehabilitation, and recovery through therapy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 July 2012: Standard registration
- DIFFERENT STROKES TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN JOHN HALL MR | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND SIMON INGLEBY | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK WILLIAM ROSE | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2018 | 06/04/2019 | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days | |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days | |
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 25 June 2021 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 FEB 2012 as amended on 21 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
"TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR IMPRISONMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND DIFFICULT CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND IMPROVING THEIR CHANCES OF RESETTLEMENT UPON RELEASE"
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 St Cuthberts Street
Bedford
MK40 3JG
- Phone:
- 01234357595
- Email:
- novpc@novakovic.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window