GROWING PEOPLE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Growing People provides social and therapeutic horticulture for people with a wide range of mental health issues, mainly in the Stevenage and North Hertfordshire area. There are a range of services to suit individuals at different stages of their Recovery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £8,404 from 4 government contract(s) and £8,404 from 4 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Cambridgeshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 10 August 2012: Standard registration
- 23 October 2022: Funds transferred to 295219 The Sadie Centre
- 11 October 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.95k | £63.70k | £73.29k | £33.91k | £44.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.70k | £73.59k | £66.34k | £60.05k | £52.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £27.44k | £19.90k | £15.44k | N/A | £8.40k | |
|
Income from government grants | £32.76k | N/A | £9.64k | £9.67k | £8.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 JUN 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/08/2012
Charitable objects
1. TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS. 2. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF PEOPLE WITH MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES OR WHO ARE RECOVERING FROM AN ILLNESS TO PREVENT THEM FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK EXPERIENCE AND VOCATIONAL SKILLS TRAINING TO REINFORCE THEIR 'SKILLS FOR LIFE' THROUGH GARDENING AND HORTICULTURE, STRENGTHEN THEIR CONFIDENCE AND SELF-ESTEEM, PROVIDE THEM WITH THE APPROPRIATE TRANSFERABLE SKILLS TO SUPPORT THEM TO RE-INTEGRATE INTO THE WIDER COMMUNITY AND INCREASE THEIR CHANCES OF EMPLOYABILITY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MAY ALSO INCLUDE THOSE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window