SHREWSBURY U3A

Charity Number: 1148657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Shrewsbury U3A has self organised interest groups for people not in full time gainful employment who are in their Third Age. This being the period of time after the second age of full time employment and/or parental responsibility.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £32,407
Total expenditure: £28,770

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 August 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL REECE Chair 15 October 2018
None on record
Paul Claes Trustee 21 October 2024
None on record
Russell Game Trustee 19 September 2024
SHREWSBURY CIVIC SOCIETY TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Ian Hallworth Trustee 10 September 2024
None on record
Frank Velander Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Ian Tanner Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Jan Dale Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Patricia Cooke Trustee 18 October 2021
None on record
Patricia Coulthard-Jones Trustee 17 September 2021
None on record
Keith James Winter Trustee 15 October 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BAYSTON HILL, SHREWSBURY
Received: 179 days late
Alwyn Winter Trustee 15 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £21.21k £13.62k £24.18k £26.91k £32.41k
Total expenditure £16.08k £11.53k £28.62k £23.71k £28.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 02 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 25 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 04 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 04 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Dyke Yaxley Ltd
1 Brassey Road
SHREWSBURY
Shropshire
SY3 7FA
Phone:
07800689201