Trustees SHREWSBURY U3A

Charity Number: 1148657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL REECE Chair 15 October 2018
None on record
Paul Claes Trustee 21 October 2024
None on record
Russell Game Trustee 19 September 2024
SHREWSBURY CIVIC SOCIETY TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Ian Hallworth Trustee 10 September 2024
None on record
Frank Velander Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Ian Tanner Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Jan Dale Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Patricia Cooke Trustee 18 October 2021
None on record
Patricia Coulthard-Jones Trustee 17 September 2021
None on record
Keith James Winter Trustee 15 October 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BAYSTON HILL, SHREWSBURY
Received: 179 days late
Alwyn Winter Trustee 15 October 2018
None on record