TRUMACAR PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds for pupils at Trumacar Primary School to take part in activities run by the school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Lancashire
Governance
- 01 October 2012: Standard registration
- TRUMACAR FRIENDS (Working name)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL SLATER | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Hopwood | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Rawes | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Scott Hopwood | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.58k | £5.61k | £1.38k | £6.45k | £6.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.17k | £3.06k | £1.05k | £2.20k | £4.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 March 2025 | 293 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 297 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JUN 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THIS ASSOCIATION IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: * DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; * ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trumacar Cp School
Combermere Road
Heysham
MORECAMBE
Lancashire
LA3 2ST
- Phone:
- 01524851043
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window