Financial history REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD FOUNTAIN OF HOPE

Charity number: 1149054
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2013 31/05/2014 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017
Total gross income £10.89k £13.30k £10.47k £6.40k £2.34k
Total expenditure £13.43k £18.32k £9.96k £4.54k £1.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A