REVIVE INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ReVive International supports the work of a Brazilian NGO called 'ReaViva'. They work with young girls who have been forced into prostitution, have suffered from physical or sexual abuse or who find themselves in situations of sexual exploitation. ReVive is currently supporting their home for young girls and their other charitable activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Brazil
Governance
- 19 September 2012: Standard registration
- REVIVE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDY ROBERTS | Chair | 05 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Johnson | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Barlow | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MIKE NORTH | Trustee | 05 July 2012 |
|
|||||
RACHEL BARLOW MACLURE | Trustee | 05 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
REV JIM ROBERTS | Trustee | 05 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.89k | £158.68k | £133.43k | £123.16k | £219.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.57k | £168.18k | £211.66k | £227.12k | £176.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 JUN 2012 AS AMENDED ON 13/09/2012
Charitable objects
1.THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 2. TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: • MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; • OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; • RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; • RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; • PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; • PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; • INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS. 3. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FOLLOWING DECLARATION AND STATEMENT OF FAITH: DECLARATION WE PROFESS THE TRINITARIAN FAITH AS IT IS UNIQUELY REVEALED IN THE HOLY SCRIPTURES AND SET FORTH IN THE CATHOLIC CREEDS. UNDER THE GUIDANCE OF THE HOLY SPIRIT, THIS FAITH HAS BEEN PRESERVED IN THE HISTORIC FORMULARIES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, PARTICULARLY THE 39 ARTICLES OF RELIGION, THE VARIOUS BOOKS OF COMMON PRAYER, AND THE ORDINALS OF THE DIFFERENT PROVINCES AND CHURCHES OF THE ANGLICAN COMMUNION. THIS FAITH, HOWEVER, HAS TO BE PROCLAIMED AFRESH AND APPLIED IN EACH GENERATION AND IN EVERY CULTURE. WE ENCOURAGE IN SERVICE THOSE WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED CONVERSION TO CHRIST, ARE BEING RENEWED BY THE WORK OF THE HOLY SPIRIT, ARE COMMITTED TO THE LOCAL AS WELL AS THE WORLDWIDE MISSION OF THE CHURCH AND WHO CAN ASSENT TO THIS DECLARATION IN GOOD FAITH. ETHOS STATEMENT WE AFFIRM THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS UNIQUELY REVEALED IN THE BIBLE AND EXPRESSED IN THE ANGLICAN CHURCH?S HISTORIC CREEDS. WE BELIEVE IN THE SOVEREIGNTY AND GRACE OF GOD THE HOLY TRINITY ? IN THE INITIAL AND ONGOING POWER AND LOVE OF THE FATHER IN AND THROUGH CREATION; IN THE INCARNATION LIFE, DEATH AND RESURRECTION OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AS THE UNIQUE GROUND FOR OUR SALVATION AND SANCTIFICATION; AND IN THE HOLY SPIRIT WHO GIVES LIFE TO ALL CREATION AND IS GIVEN TO INDIVIDUALS AND THE CHURCH FOR AN ON-GOING MINISTRY OF COMFORT AND CHALLENGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 BISHOPS WAY
YORK
YO10 5JG
- Phone:
- 01904413479
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window