LAWYERS FOR JUSTICE IN LIBYA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS (INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, BY DEFENDING JUSTICE AND PROMOTING THE RULE OF LAW) IN LIBYA (AND, TO THE EXTENT CONSISTENT WITH THE CHARITYS PRIMARY OBJECTS, IN OTHER COUNTRIES) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITYS TRUSTEES THINK FIT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,430,340
Donations and legacies | £28.85k | |
Charitable activities | £2.37m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £33.21k |
Total expenditure:
£2,387,656
Raising funds | £58.80k | |
Charitable activities | £2.33m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £697,175 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £58.80k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.33m | |
Retained for future use | £42.68k |
People

13 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Camden
- Islington
- Egypt
- Libya
- Tunisia
Governance
- 17 May 2013: Standard registration
- LFJL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW BALFOUR | Chair | 13 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Fayruz Abdulhadi | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ghazi Gheblawi | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lutz Oette | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mervet Mhanni | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mariam Elhadri | Trustee | 09 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £686.34k | £813.51k | £1.14m | £748.28k | £2.43m | |
|
Total expenditure | £637.99k | £715.87k | £755.84k | £1.08m | £2.39m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £697.18k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £154.82k | £204.20k | £175.83k | £165.50k | £28.85k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £520.20k | £597.30k | £947.74k | £576.79k | £2.37m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £11.32k | £12.00k | £15.60k | £6.00k | £33.21k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £600.67k | £660.12k | £702.57k | £1.04m | £2.33m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £37.32k | £55.75k | £53.27k | £41.17k | £58.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £36.39k | £10.51k | £2.23k | £12.51k | £34.17k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £239.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £12.64k | £9.48k | £7.11k | £0 | £33.54k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £425.80k | £385.56k | £675.27k | £388.24k | £536.13k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £285.76k | £144.72k | £48.73k | £86.24k | £224.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 AUG 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS (INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, BY DEFENDING JUSTICE AND PROMOTING THE RULE OF LAW) IN LIBYA (AND, TO THE EXTENT CONSISTENT WITH THE CHARITYS PRIMARY OBJECTS, IN OTHER COUNTRIES) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITYS TRUSTEES THINK FIT, BY ALL OR ANY OF (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE FOLLOWING MEANS: - MONITORING OBSERVANCE AND ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND FACILITATING THE COLLECTION OF EVIDENCE AND ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; - OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSES; - RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; - EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS; - PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; - CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW AND THE ADMINISTRATION OF OTHER LAWS IN A MANNER CONSISTENT WITH HUMAN RIGHTS; - COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION AND ON OTHER PROPOSED LEGISLATION FROM THE PERSPECTIVE OF THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS; - RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; - PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; - PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; - INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; AND - ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Floor 1
Fergusson House
124-128 City Road
- Phone:
- +44 207 6096734
- Email:
- info@libyanjustice.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window