LAMBETH MUSIC EDUCATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
* Raising funds to support music education in Lambeth by, inter alia: Administering a Bursary Fund to support families with financial hardship to access tuition; Administering an instrument fund to provide access to instruments and to help pupils to buy them; Providing financial support for special projects, educational visits and music tours.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lambeth
Governance
- 07 March 2013: Standard registration
- 25 January 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LMET (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 28/02/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.60k | £133.72k | £245.39k | £140.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.97k | £89.77k | £328.99k | £101.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2018 | 09 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2018 | 09 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 28 September 2017 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | 28 September 2017 | 90 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 30 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 30 June 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/08/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN RESIDING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ADMINISTERING A BURSARY FUND TO SUPPORT FAMILIES WITH FINANCIAL HARDSHIP TO ACCESS MUSIC TUITION; ADMINISTERING AN INSTRUMENT FUND TO PROVIDE ACCESS TO INSTRUMENTS AND TO HELP PUPILS BUY THEM AND PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR SPECIAL PROJECTS, EDUCATIONAL VISITS AND MUSIC TOURS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window